Hasspieler, Ralph Andre (CPSO#: 55640)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Oct 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Oct 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 305
1950 Algonquin Avenue
North Bay ON  P1B 4Z2
Phone: (705) 495-0300
Fax: (705) 495-8400
Electoral District: 08

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Virginia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RALPH ANDRE HASSPIELER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HASSPIELER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1985 to 16 Jun 1986
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Jul 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2010
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 07 Sep 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 2011