Hastings, Deborah Mary (CPSO#: 31760)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Jun 1979

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jul 1980

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone: (905) 547-3708
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ricci Hastings Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 12 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Ricci ( CPSO# 32950 )
Dr. D. Hastings ( CPSO# 31760 )

Business Address:
Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 527-0271

Business Address:
Juravinski Hospital
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 389-4411

Business Address:
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
726 Upper James Street
Hamilton ON  L9C 2Z9
Phone Number: (905) 575-5743

Business Address:
1960 Appleby Line
Suite 32
Burlington ON  L7L 0B7
Phone Number: (905) 335-1888

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 11 Jun 1984 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 03 Dec 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEBORAH MARY HASTINGS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HASTINGS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 1980