Hastings, Donald Kevin (CPSO#: 32594)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1981

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Chatham Kent Family Health Team
20 Emma St
Chatham ON  N7L 5K5
Phone: (519) 354-2172
Fax: 8665396714
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Donald Hastings Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 30 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Pepper ( CPSO# 57102 )
Dr. D. Hastings ( CPSO# 32594 )

Business Address:
141 Richmond Street
Chatham ON  N7M 1P1
Phone Number: (519) 397-5222

Business Address:
Chatham-Kent Family Health Team
207 - 20 Emma Street
Chatham ON  N7L 5K5
Phone Number: (519) 354-2172

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Chatham Public General Hospital Society Chatham
St Joseph's Health Services,Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
Sydenham District Hospital Wallaceburg

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DONALD KEVIN HASTINGS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HASTINGS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1981

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: April 19, 2017
Expiry Date: May 9, 2017
Summary:
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)