Hataley, Joy Marie (CPSO#: 75225)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Jun 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
791 Princess Street
Suite 201
Kingston ON  K7L 1E9
Phone: (613) 542-7002 Ext. 239
Fax: (613) 544-7247
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Lennox and Addington County
General Hospital
8 Richmond Park Drive
Napanee ON  K7R 2Z4
Canada
Phone: (613) 354-3301
County: County of Lennox and Addington
Electoral District: 06

Queen's University
Department of Family Medicine
Bag 888
220 Bagot Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5E9
Canada
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Joy Hataley Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 12 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Hataley ( CPSO# 75225 )

Business Address:
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-3232

Business Address:
Suite 201
791 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7L 1E9
Phone Number: (613) 544-2727

Business Address:
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3400

Business Address:
8 Richmond Park Drive
Napanee ON  K7R 2Z4
Phone Number: (613) 354-3301

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOY MARIE HATALEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HATALEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 12 Jan 2010 to 11 Jan 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2000