Hatano, Hisashi (CPSO#: 77168)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Mar 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Mar 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Nagoya University School of Medicine, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2001 to 30 Sep 2002
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2002 to 31 Mar 2003
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Nov 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2003