Hatcher, David Scott (CPSO#: 66417)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grey Bruce Health Services
P O Box 1400
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone: (519) 376-2121
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

250 10th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 2S4
Canada
Phone: (519) 371-1008
County: County of Grey
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hatcher Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 02 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Hatcher ( CPSO# 66417 )

Business Address:
Grey Bruce Health Services
Owen Sound Site
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone Number: (519) 376-2121

Business Address:
Owen Sound Surgical Centre Inc.
250 10th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 1S4
Phone Number: (519) 371-1007

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID SCOTT HATCHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HATCHER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1998