Hatcher, Michael Cecil Edward (CPSO#: 66887)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 May 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 May 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1200 Fourth Avenue
st catherines ontario
L2S 0A9
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone: (905) 378-4647 Ext. 45000
Fax: (905) 704-4766
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael Hatcher Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 13 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Hatcher ( CPSO# 66887 )

Business Address:
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL CECIL EDWARD HATCHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HATCHER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2002
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 14 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 May 2011