Hatchuel, Ilana (CPSO#: 50694)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 17 Sep 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 17 Sep 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Afrikaans, English, Hebrew

Education:University of Witwatersrand, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 17 Sep 1997