Hatfield, Jack Gibson (CPSO#: 41019)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jack Hatfield Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 5 2013

Medical Records Location

Address: P.O. Box 365 Parry Sound, ON P2A 2X4
Date Received: 28 Apr 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 23 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 1965
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Mar 1969
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 May 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014