Hattersley, Beverly Anne (CPSO#: 64128)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Aug 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Peters Hospital
88 Maplewood Avenue
Hamilton ON  L8M 1W9
Phone: (905) 777-3837 Ext. 12250
Fax: (905) 549-6829
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation,St. Peter's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BEVERLY ANNE HATTERSLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HATTERSLEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 1992