Hauffe, Herbert Wulff Dietrich (CPSO#: 19842)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2001

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:Oxford University, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1964
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Apr 1966
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2001

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 24 Nov 1994
Summary:

 In November 1994, Dr. Hauffe pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, as defined in 
 s. 29(33) of Ontario Regulation 548/90, as amended, in that he engaged in conduct or an act 
 relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would 
 reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.  The Discipline 
 Committee accepted this plea, and found Dr. Hauffe guilty of professional misconduct.  The 
 Committee agreed to a joint submission as to penalty, and consequently ordered that Dr. Hauffe be 
 reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register.  The Committee also 
 ruled that Dr. Hauffe's licence to practice be suspended for a period of two months.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Nov 24, 1994