Haukioja, Ari Heimo Olavi (CPSO#: 27405)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Jun 1975

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 24 Jul 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cobourg Clinic
44 University Avenue East
P O Box 86
Cobourg ON  K9A 4K4
Phone: (905) 372-3323
Fax: (905) 372-3692
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Haukioja Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 16 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Haukioja ( CPSO# 27405 )

Business Address:
Cobourg Clinic
44 University Avenue East
Cobourg ON  K9A 2G5
Phone Number: (905) 372-3323

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Northumberland Hills Hospital,Cobourg District General Site Cobourg

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1975
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2015
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 24 Jul 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 24 Jul 2015 Active View Details [+]
            As from July 24, 2015, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Ari Heimo Olavi
            Haukioja, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Haukioja
            to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  With the exception of his inpatient hospital practice of labour and
                  delivery, Dr. Haukioja has voluntarily relinquished his prescribing
                  privileges with respect to the following drugs, substances and
                  preparations set out in the corresponding regulations, as amended from
                  time to time, and summarized as follows:
                  
            Narcotic Drugs
            (from the Narcotic Control Regulations
             made under the Controlled Drugs
             and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19)    Relinquished

            Narcotic Preparations
            (from the Narcotic Control Regulations
             made under the Controlled Drugs
             and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19)    Relinquished

            Controlled Drugs
            (from Part G of the Food and Drug Regulations
             under the Food and Drugs
             Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27)                 Relinquished

            Benzodiazepines/Other Targeted Substances
            (from the Benzodiazepines and Other 
            Targeted Substances Regulations made 
            under the Controlled Drugs and 
            Substances Act., S.C., 1996, S.C.,19)      Relinquished

            All Other Monitored Drugs
            (as defined under the Narcotic Safety and  Relinquished
            Awareness Act, S.O., 2010, c. 22)