Hausen, Doris Magdalene (CPSO#: 50695)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jan 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jan 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 5
1310 Don Mills Road
North York ON  M3B 2W6
Phone: (416) 444-6999
Fax: (416) 444-0896
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D. Hausen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 17 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Hausen ( CPSO# 50695 )

Business Address:
Suite 5
1310 Don Mills Road
North York ON  M3B 2W6
Phone Number: (416) 444-6999

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 29 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist
Nuclear Medicine Effective: 01 Dec 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DORIS MAGDALENE HAUSEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAUSEN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 1987