Haust, Maria Daria (CPSO#: 32219)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 22 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 22 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, German, Polish

Education:Ruprecht Karl Univ of Heidelberg, 1951

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: The University Hospital Department of Pathology 339 Windermere Road London, Ontario N6A 5A5
Date Received: 30 Jul 2013


Address: The University Hospital Department of Pathology 339 Windermere Road London ON N6A 5A5
Date Received: 30 Jul 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 10 Nov 1959 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Nov 1957
Transfer of class of registration to: Specified Certificate Effective: 03 May 1963
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Mar 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 1994
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Jul 2013