Haw, Charles Sung (CPSO#: 65060)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2000 to 31 Mar 2000
Elective Trainee - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Aug 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Sep 2003
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2011