Hawaleshka, Adrian (CPSO#: 73140)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Apr 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Apr 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Ukrainian

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Health Science Centre
GH - 611 820 Sherbrook Street
Winnipeg MB  R3A 1R9
Phone: (204) 787-3796

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Manitoba
Saskatchewan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ADRIAN HAWALESHKA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAWALESHKA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 19 Nov 1998 to 16 Dec 1998
Elective Trainee - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Dec 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Apr 2005