Hawash Mostafa, Fatma El-Zahraa (CPSO#: 51257)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Nov 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Nov 1986

Summary

Former Name: Mostafa, Fatima (used until: 24 Feb 1987 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Cairo, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
499 oxford street east
London ON  N5Y 3H8
Phone: 519 672 1495
Fax: 519 434 3048
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Fatma Mostafa Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 11 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Hawash Mostafa ( CPSO# 51257 )

Business Address:
499 Oxford Street East
London ON  N5Y 3H8
Phone Number: (519) 672-1495

Medical Records Location

Address: City Centre Archives 1020 Pond Mills Road London, ON N6N 1A2 Telephone: 519-451-3486
Date Received: 05 Mar 2015

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FATMA EL-ZAHRAA HAWASH MOSTAFA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAWASH MOSTAFA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jul 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Nov 1986
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Nov 1986
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 12 Nov 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1989