Hawker, Gillian Alexandra (CPSO#: 53967)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 May 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department Of Medicine
University Of Toronto
R F E 3805
190 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 946-8071
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Perlmutar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 01 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Perlmutar ( CPSO# 51327 )
Dr. G. Hawker ( CPSO# 53967 )

Business Address:
235 Danforth Avenue
Suite 100
Toronto ON  M4K 1N2
Phone Number: (416) 466-1311

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 03 Dec 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GILLIAN ALEXANDRA HAWKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAWKER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1984 to 17 Jun 1985
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 5 - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 May 1990