Hawkes, Michael Thomas (CPSO#: 81465)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Alberta, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 13 Sep 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 2005
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014