Hawkins Villarreal, Michael Amet (CPSO#: 98665)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Universidad De Panama, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Toronto
Department of Psychiatry
250 College Street Suite 841
Toronto ON  M5T 1R9
Phone: 416-979-6948
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL AMET HAWKINS VILLARREAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAWKINS VILLARREAL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 22 Sep 2012
Assessment Verification Period - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 17 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017