Haworth, Angela Clair (CPSO#: 33802)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Mar 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department Of Pathology
Joseph Brant Hospital
Burlington ON  L7S 1W7
Phone: (905) 632-3730 Ext. 1204
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 01 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANGELA CLAIR HAWORTH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAWORTH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1980 to 16 Jun 1981
Other - Rotating Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - Neuropathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Neuropathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Neuropathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Pathology and Bacteriology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Jun 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Nov 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Jul 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Mar 1989