Hawryluck, Laura Andrea (CPSO#: 64941)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
Room 411N 2nd Floor MCL
399 Bathurst St
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5800 Ext. 2507
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hawryluck Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 03 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Hawryluck ( CPSO# 64941 )

Business Address:
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
Room 411N
2nd Floor Fell Building
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-2507

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAURA ANDREA HAWRYLUCK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAWRYLUCK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Other - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1993