Hawrylyshyn, Stephen Paul (CPSO#: 100363)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown ON  L7G 2B8
Phone: (905)873-0111
Fax: 905-338-4146
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville ON  L9W 4X9
Canada
Phone: 519-941-2410
Fax: 905-338-4146
County: County of Dufferin
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stephen Hawrylyshyn Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 07 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Hawrylyshyn ( CPSO# 100363)

Business Address:
100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville ON  L9W 4X9
Phone Number: (519) 941-2410

Business Address:
1 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown ON  L7G 2B8
Phone Number: (905) 873-0111

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Headwaters Health Care Centre,Orangeville-Dufferin Site Orangeville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHEN PAUL HAWRYLYSHYN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAWRYLYSHYN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2015