Hay, Annette Elizabeth (CPSO#: 97154)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2020

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Jul 2014

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Dundee, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Division of Hematology
Burr 2
25 King Street W
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 544-2631 Ext. 4501
Fax: (613) 546-8201
Electoral District: 06
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Kingston Health Sciences Centre
KGH Site
Division of Hematology
94 Stuart St
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6
Canada
Phone: (613) 533-2946
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

Cancer Research Institute
10 Stuart St
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6
Canada
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Annette Hay Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 13 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Hay ( CPSO# 97154 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Division of Hematology
Burr 2
25 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 544-2631

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Divison of Hematology
94 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6
Phone Number: (613) 533-2946

Business Address:
Cancer Research Institute
10 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6
Phone Number: (613) 533-6430

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Hematology Effective: 01 Jul 2014 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jan 2012 to 24 Mar 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Mar 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 28 Dec 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Apr 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2020

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 06 Apr 2017 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Annette Elizabeth Hay may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
                        Division of Haematology/Oncology, Queen's University, in which Dr.
                        Hay holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant
                        Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
                  the date of issuance or when Dr. Hay no longer holds the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Hay's clinical
                        performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or
                        academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Hay's certificate of
                        registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
                        report. 
                  
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on July 1, 2014, and expires on June 30, 2020.
                  Upon renewal of Dr. Hay's academic appointment at Queen's University, the
                  expiry  date  can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2
                  and 3 above.