Hay, John Keith (CPSO#: 52957)

Current Status: Active Member - CPSO Staff as of 29 Apr 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
80 College Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2E2
Phone: (416) 967-2600 Ext. 482
Fax: (416) 967-2605
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

105 Shipley Street
Clinton ON  N0M 1L0
Canada
Phone: (519) 482-3000
Fax: (519) 482-7648
County: County of Huron
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Keith Hay Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 02 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Hay ( CPSO# 52957 )

Business Address:
7217 Gelert Road
Haliburton ON  K0M 1S0
Phone Number: (705) 457-1212

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Clinton Public Hospital Clinton
Haliburton Highlands Health Services,Haliburton Site Haliburton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1985 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN KEITH HAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1984