Hay, John (CPSO#: 21416)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1945

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1970 CFPC Specialist
Radiation Oncology Effective: 01 Dec 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1993