Hay, Marshall Alexander (CPSO#: 76426)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Sep 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Sep 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
790 Bay Street
Suite 322
PO Box 11
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone: (416) 598-5665
Fax: (416) 591-1162
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Marshall Hay Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 19 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Hay ( CPSO# 76426 )

Business Address:
Suite 322
790 Bay Street
PO Box 11
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone Number: (416) 598-5665

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARSHALL ALEXANDER HAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2006