Hayes, Ailish Mary (CPSO#: 33228)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 20 Jun 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 20 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:National University of Ireland, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 08 Jun 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 May 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Jun 2000