Hayes, Jason Alexander (CPSO#: 69139)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anesthesia
Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7654 Ext. 208963
Fax: (416) 813-7543
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jason A. Hayes Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 16 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Hayes ( CPSO# 69139 )

Business Address:
Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-8963

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JASON ALEXANDER HAYES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAYES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000