Hayes, Tracy Elizabeth (CPSO#: 79233)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 9
2120 Regent Road South
Sudbury ON  P3E 3Z9
Phone: (705) 523-9199
Fax: (705) 523-9197
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. T. E. Hayes Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 31 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Hayes ( CPSO# 79233 )

Business Address:
200 - 1164 Devonshire Avenue
North Bay ON  P1B 6X7

Business Address:
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7100

Business Address:
Unit 9
2120 Regent Street
Sudbury ON  P3E 3Z9
Phone Number: (705) 523-9199

Business Address:
680 Kirkwood Drive
Sudbury ON  P3E 1X3

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury
North Bay Regional Health Centre - Kirkwood Place Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2005 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 11 Dec 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TRACY ELIZABETH HAYES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAYES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2005