Hayes, Vonda Marlene (CPSO#: 68572)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Nov 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Nov 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Dalhousie University, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1976 CFPC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 11 Oct 1994 to 04 Nov 1994
Other - Geriatric Medicine

University of Toronto, 11 Oct 2001 to 30 Nov 2001
Clinical Fellow - Palliative Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Oct 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Nov 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Oct 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 2001