Hayman, Kellie May Parks (CPSO#: 77711)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Aug 2004

Summary

Former Name: Parks, Kellie May (used until: 27 Aug 2003 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ross Memorial Hospital
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON  K9V 4M8
Phone: (705) 324-6111
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K. Hayman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 19 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Hayman ( CPSO# 77711 )

Business Address:
Ross Memorial Hospital
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON  K9V 4M8
Phone Number: (705) 324-6191

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 21 Jun 2004 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 11 Dec 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KELLIE MAY PARKS HAYMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAYMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Jan 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2004