Haynes, Robert Brian (CPSO#: 24697)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jul 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. R.B. Haynes Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 22 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: Hamilton Health Sciences Health Records Room 1D14 1200 Main Street West Hamilton, ON L8N 3Z5 Tel: 905 521 2100
Date Received: 18 Apr 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 14 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2016