Hayter, Charles Robert Russell (CPSO#: 54415)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jun 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-1100 Ext. 5000
Fax: (905) 813-3962
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Charles Hayter Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 17 2018

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 15 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHARLES ROBERT RUSSELL HAYTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAYTER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Nov 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Oct 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jun 1991