Hayward, Melissa Lynn (CPSO#: 86776)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Josephs Healthcare Hamilton
Emergency Department
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 33112
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Brantford General Hospital
Emergency Department
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R1G9
Canada
Phone: (519) 751-5544
County: County of Brant
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. Hayward Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 01 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Hayward ( CPSO# 86776 )

Business Address:
St Josephs Healthcare Hamilton
Emergency Department
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Business Address:
2757 King Street East
Hamilton ON  L8N 5E4
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MELISSA LYNN HAYWARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAYWARD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012