Hayward, Susan Lynn (CPSO#: 63609)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Sep 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queen Square Doctors
Suite 201
366 Main Street North
Brampton ON  L6V 1P8
Phone: (905) 455-1455
Fax: (905) 455-5498
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUSAN LYNN HAYWARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAYWARD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 1992