Hayward-Stewart, Amber Ann (CPSO#: 69363)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 7
389 Main Street
Picton ON  K0K 2T0
Phone: (613) 476-5744
Fax: (613) 476-8773
Electoral District: 06
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

242 King Street
QHC - Trenton Memorial Hosptial
Trenton ON  K8A 5S6
Canada
Phone: (613) 392-2540
County: County of Hastings
Electoral District: 06

Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward
Site
PO Box 1900
403 Main Street East
Picton ON  K0K 2T0
Canada
Phone: (613) 476-2181
County: County of Prince Edward
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Amber Hayward-Stewart Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 02 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Hayward-Stewart ( CPSO# 69363 )

Business Address:
Belleville General Hospital
272 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone Number: (613) 969-5511

Business Address:
Trenton Memorial Hospital
242 King Street East
Trenton ON  K8V 5S6
Phone Number: (613) 392-2541

Business Address:
Quinte Health Care Prince Edward County Memorial
PO Box 1900
403 Main Street East
Picton ON  K0K 2T0
Phone Number: (613) 476-5744

Business Address:
Suite 7
389 Main Street
Picton ON  K9K 2T0
Phone Number: (613) 476-5744

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Health Care,Trenton Memorial Trenton
Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site Picton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMBER ANN HAYWARD-STEWART may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAYWARD-STEWART is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1997