Haywood-Farmer, Eric (CPSO#: 84887)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 12 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 12 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Eric Haywood-Farmer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 20 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 17 Oct 2012 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2008
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Jun 2014