Hazan, Sandra Joan (CPSO#: 59375)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jul 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
692 euclid avenue
Toronto ON  M6G 2T9
Phone: (416) 483-3144
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SANDRA JOAN HAZAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAZAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1989