Haziza, Philippe (CPSO#: 64593)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Sep 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 02 Oct 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:University of Montreal, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
340-440 Laurier
Ottawa ON  K1R 7X6
Phone: (613) 702-4661
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P. Haziza Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 05 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Haziza ( CPSO# 64593 )

Business Address:
340 - 440 Laurier Avenue West
Ottawa ON  K1R 7X6
Phone Number: (613) 702-4661

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 1991
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Oct 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 02 Oct 2010

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 02 Oct 2010 Active View Details [+]
            As from October 2, 2010, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Philippe Haziza, in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Haziza to the College
            of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr. Haziza may not engage in the practice of upper endoscopies,
                  colonoscopies and/or sigmoidoscopies.
                  

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: January 30, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)