Head, Donald Richard (CPSO#: 60187)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Partners
Mississauga Hospital
Psychiatry Administration
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone: (905) 848-7585
Fax: (905) 848-7368
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Head Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 20 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Head ( CPSO# 60187 )

Business Address:
Trillium Health Partners
Mississauga Hospital
Psychiatry Admin
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7100

Business Address:
Summerville Family Health Team
101 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2P7
Phone Number: (905) 272-9700

Business Address:
Trilluim Health Partners
The Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-1100

Business Address:
Trilluim Health Partners
Queensway Health Centre
150 Sherway Drive
Toronto ON  M9C 1A5
Phone Number: (416) 259-6671

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DONALD RICHARD HEAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEAD is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Oct 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1990