Healey, Brenda Jane (CPSO#: 55650)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Oct 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Oct 1986

Summary

Former Name: Smith, Brenda Jane (used until: 24 Jun 1987 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Canton Potsdam Hospital
50 Leroy St
Potsdam NY  13676
United States
Phone: 315-265-3300

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - New York
USA - Vermont

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 1998 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Dec 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRENDA JANE HEALEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEALEY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Jun 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 1986