Healey, David Charles (CPSO#: 69266)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David Healey Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 11 2015

Medical Records Location

Address: ODS PO Box 2071 Sudbury, ON P3A 4R8 Tel: 705 560 8461 Fax: 705 524 8012 odstorage@persona.ca
Date Received: 17 Jun 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 2000
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015