Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Healey, Jeffrey Sean (CPSO#: 69009)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Sep 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
H H S C - Hamilton General Site
Room C3-121
30 Birge Street
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 577-8004
Fax: (905) 297-3786
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J. Healey Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 10 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Healey ( CPSO# 69009 )

Business Address:
H H S C
Hamilton General Site
Room C3-121
30 Birge Street
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 577-8004

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Centre for Mountain Health Services Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 11 Sep 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEFFREY SEAN HEALEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEALEY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 1999