Hearnden, Trevor Alan (CPSO#: 33338)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: T. A. Hearnden Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 23 2015

Medical Records Location

Address: 91 King St E Colborne ON K0K 1S0
Date Received: 25 May 2017

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1981 to 15 Jun 1982
Resident 1 - Rotating Internship

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2002
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017