Heasman, Kaaren Zoe (CPSO#: 56778)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Colonnade Business Building
131 Bloor Street West, Office 501
Toronto ON  M5S 1R1
Phone: (416) 928-0361
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D. Dorenbaum & K.Z. Heasman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 20 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Heasman ( CPSO# 56778 )
Dr. D. Dorenbaum ( CPSO# 50451 )

Business Address:
554 Spadina Crescent
Toronto ON  M5S 2J9
Phone Number: (416) 925-8536

Business Address:
Clarke Institute of Psychiatry
250 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 535-8501

Business Address:
Colonnade Business Building
Suite 501
131 Bloor Street West
Toronto ON  M5S 1R1
Phone Number: (416) 928-0361

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAAREN ZOE HEASMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEASMAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1987