Heath, David Stanley (CPSO#: 24795)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jul 1972

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jul 1972

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Liverpool, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sun Life Financial
Mailbox 3 N 334
50 Westmount Road N
Waterloo ON  N2L 2R5
Phone: (519) 497-0959
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Heath Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 06 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Heath ( CPSO# 24795 )

Business Address:
50 Westmount Road North
Suite 3N 334
Waterloo ON  N2L 2R5
Phone Number: (519) 497-0959

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 13 Nov 1972 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID STANLEY HEATH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEATH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1967
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1972