Heath, Edward Lawrence (CPSO#: 21302)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Mar 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Mar 2014

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 May 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Mar 2014

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 22 Dec 1995
Summary:

  
 In December 1995, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Heath guilty of professional misconduct, 
 as defined in Ontario Regulation 548/90, as amended, in that he falsified a record in respect of 
 the examination or treatment of a patient, contrary to s. 29(17); in that he committed sexual 
 impropriety with a patient, contrary to s. 29(30); and in that he engaged in conduct or an act 
 relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would 
 reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional, contrary to 
s. 29(33). Consequently, the Committee imposed the following penalty:  
 
1. Dr. Heath was to be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the 
Register.  
2. A condition was to be placed on Dr. Heath’s licence such that he be accompanied by an adult 
woman when examining woman patients, unless the patient requested otherwise.  
3. Dr. Heath’s licence to practice was to be suspended for a period of six months.  
4. The latter three months of this period of suspension were themselves to be suspended, 
provided that Dr. Heath agreed to and complied with the following:  
(a) he was to undergo a psychiatric assessment by a psychiatrist acceptable to the Registrar, 
within sixty days of this Order becoming final;  
(b) the psychiatrist was to report to the Registrar regarding this assessment and treatment plan 
within thirty days of his assessment;  
(c) there was to be ongoing assessment and treatment by the psychiatrist at such frequency and 
for such duration as deemed necessary by him;  
(d) the psychiatrist was to submit quarterly reports, acceptable to the Registrar, regarding Dr. 
Heaths progress and his likelihood of re-offending; and  
(e) the psychiatrist was to be supplied with the Committees decision and reasons for decision 
prior to the initial assessment.  
5. In default of compliance with the foregoing provisions, the suspension of the remaining three 
months of the period of suspension was to be removed. 

August 22, 1997 - Dr. Heath's appeal to the Divisional Court was allowed and the Decision of 
the Discipline Committee to be quashed. 

 

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Decision Overruled
Appeal Decision Date: 22 Aug 1997
Hearing Date(s): 23 Jan 1995