Heathcote, Elizabeth Jane Lindsay (CPSO#: 42357)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: Toronto Western Hospital Liver Clinic Room 6BFP 399 Bathurst Street Toronto, Ontario M5T 2S8 Tel: 416 603 5914
Date Received: 21 Jun 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1981 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 08 Dec 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jun 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Oct 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2013