Heathcote, John Christopher (CPSO#: 31638)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 05 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Biochemistry Effective: 05 Dec 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Medical Biochemistry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Jul 1991